WA SB5466 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-25 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-25 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying employee eligibility for benefits from the public employees' benefits board and conforming the eligibility provisions with federal law.
Title
Clarifying employee eligibility for benefits from the public employees' benefits board and conforming the eligibility provisions with federal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-25 | Senate | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-04-25 | Senate | Chapter 116, 2015 Laws. |
2015-04-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-25 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |