WA SB5496 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changing explicit alternative routes to teacher certification program requirements to expectations for program outcomes.
Title
Changing explicit alternative routes to teacher certification program requirements to expectations for program outcomes.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1770 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.