WA SB5599 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring unused state funds for the health care benefits of long-term care workers to be returned to the state.
Title
Requiring unused state funds for the health care benefits of long-term care workers to be returned to the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5599&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5599.pdf |