WA SB5687 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing greenhouse gas emissions through land use and transportation requirements.
Title
Reducing greenhouse gas emissions through land use and transportation requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-02 | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-03-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-23 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-23 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-28 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1490 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.