WA SB5781 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning organized retail theft.
Title
Concerning organized retail theft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |