WA SB5802 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changing professional educator standards board provisions.
Title
Changing professional educator standards board provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Fred Jarrett [D] | Sen. Claudia Kauffman [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] |
Sen. Eric Oemig [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-18 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-25 | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-25 | ED - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-25 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Education. | |
2009-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 13; absent, 1; excused, 3. | |
2009-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-20 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-20 | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-02 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2003 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-18 - Effective date 7/26/2009*.