WA SB5876 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the incentive in the motion picture competitiveness programs.
Title
Concerning the incentive in the motion picture competitiveness programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-03-03 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-25 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-05 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2042 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-15 - Effective date 4/15/2009.