WA SB5876 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a women's division and system of gender-responsive, risk-need-responsivity, and trauma-informed practices within the department of corrections.
Title
Creating a women's division and system of gender-responsive, risk-need-responsivity, and trauma-informed practices within the department of corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-04-01 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |