WA SB5891 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a forum for testing primary care medical home reimbursement pilot projects.
Title
Establishing a forum for testing primary care medical home reimbursement pilot projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-30 | Chapter 305, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-30 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-21 | President signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 39; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-20 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-08 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-03 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 6:00 PM. | |
2009-02-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-05 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2114 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.