WA SB5891 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date 9/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date 9/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state technology expenditures.
Title
Concerning state technology expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Effective date 9/28/2013. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Chapter 33, 2013 Laws 2nd Special Session. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2013-06-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2013-06-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-06-27 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-06-27 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2013-06-27 | House | First Reading. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-09 | House | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |