WA SB5891 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the sale and commercial display of human remains.
Title
Prohibiting the sale and commercial display of human remains.
Sponsors
Sen. Jan Angel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |