WA SB5907 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prioritizing transit agency integration for regional mobility grants in counties with a population of seven hundred thousand or more.
Title
Prioritizing transit agency integration for regional mobility grants in counties with a population of seven hundred thousand or more.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2151 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5907&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5907.pdf |