WA SB5923 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
Pending: Senate Higher Education & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
Pending: Senate Higher Education & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Washington higher education tuition payment and college savings programs.
Title
Concerning Washington higher education tuition payment and college savings programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] |
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5923&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5923.pdf |