WA SB5978 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the office of the superintendent of public instruction to act as a guarantor for a county when the county provides a loan to a school district.
Title
Authorizing the office of the superintendent of public instruction to act as a guarantor for a county when the county provides a loan to a school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |