WA SB6028 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopting the uniform electronic transactions act and aligning statutory provisions relating to signatures, declarations, and documents.
Title
Adopting the uniform electronic transactions act and aligning statutory provisions relating to signatures, declarations, and documents.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 57, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-26 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |