WA SB6028 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relieving individuals from paying interest on certain unemployment insurance overpayment assessments.
Title
Relieving individuals from paying interest on certain unemployment insurance overpayment assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | LC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1975 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-07 - Effective date 6/6/2024.