WA SB6254 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the issuance of Purple Heart license plates for more than one motor vehicle.
Title
Authorizing the issuance of Purple Heart license plates for more than one motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2017. |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 31, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-29 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |