WA SB6547 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the microenterprise development program.
Title
Regarding the microenterprise development program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2012-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-03 | EDTI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-02-01 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development, and Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-30 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |