WI AB1077 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.867 (3) (v); and to create 20.435 (1) (bd) of the statutes; Relating to: transfer from the state building trust fund to the general fund, funding for grants to support hospital emergency department services, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Transfer from the state building trust fund to the general fund, funding for grants to support hospital emergency department services, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-07 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2024-02-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:02 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-02-13 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care |
2024-02-09 | House | Introduced |