WI AB136 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 31.385 (2) (ad); and to create 31.385 (2) (ad) 2m. and 31.385 (2) (ad) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: financial assistance limits for dam removal. (FE)
Title
Financial assistance limits for dam removal. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-11-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-11-07 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-11-02 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-11-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-11-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2023-06-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-06-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-04-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-03-31 | House | Introduced |