WI AB410 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 157.061 (5), 157.061 (7), 157.07 (6), 157.11 (9g) (a) 1. b., 157.62 (3) (b) 2., 157.625 (2) and 440.91 (1) (c) 2.; to renumber and amend 157.061 (12), 157.061 (13), 157.10, 157.12 (4), 157.62 (5), 440.90 (7), 440.90 (8), 440.90 (9), 440.91 (1) (c) 1. and 979.10 (1) (c); to amend 15.07 (1) (cs), 15.405 (3m) (d), 71.07 (5r) (a) 3., 71.28 (5r) (a) 3., 71.47 (5r) (a) 3., 157.061 (3), 157.061 (4), 157.061 (11r), 157.061 (14), 157.061 (15), 157.062 (1), 157.062 (2), 157.062 (6) (b), 157.062 (6m), 157.062 (9), 157.064 (6), 157.064 (7), 157.07 (1), 157.07 (4), 157.08 (2) (b), 157.08 (5), 157.10 (title), 157.11 (2), 157.11 (9g) (a) 1. c., 157.11 (9g) (a) 2., 157.11 (9g) (c), 157.11 (9m), 157.11 (10), 157.112 (3m), 157.115 (2) (a) 1. (intro.), 157.115 (2) (a) 3., 157.115 (2) (b), 157.115 (2) (c), 157.115 (2) (d) (intro.), 157.12 (title), 157.12 (2) (a), 157.12 (2) (b), 157.12 (3) (a) 3., 157.12 (3) (b), 157.125 (1), 157.125 (2), 157.19 (5) (a), 157.19 (5) (b), 157.60, 157.62 (1) (a) (intro.), 157.62 (1) (c), 157.62 (2) (d), 157.62 (4), 157.62 (6), 157.62 (7), 157.63 (title), 157.63 (1), 157.63 (2) (intro.), 157.63 (2) (b), 157.63 (5), 157.635, 157.637, 157.64 (2) (intro.) and (a), 157.65 (1) (a), 157.65 (1) (b), 157.65 (2), 440.90 (3), 440.90 (14), 440.91 (1) (a), 440.91 (1m) (a), 440.91 (2) (intro.), 440.91 (2) (d), 440.91 (3), 440.91 (4), 440.91 (10), 440.92 (1) (a), 440.92 (1) (b) 1., 440.92 (1) (b) 3., 440.92 (1) (b) 4., 440.92 (1) (c), 440.92 (2) (a) (intro.), 440.92 (2) (d), 440.92 (3) (c) 3., 440.92 (6) (j), 440.92 (9) (title), 440.92 (9) (a), 440.92 (9) (b) (intro.), 440.92 (9) (b) 2., 440.92 (9) (b) 3., 440.92 (9) (d), 440.92 (9) (e), 440.92 (9) (f), 440.93 (2), 440.945 (5) (a), 440.945 (5) (b), 440.947 (5), 440.95 (3), 440.95 (4) (intro.), 815.18 (3) (a) and 895.04 (5); and to create 157.061 (1p), 157.10 (1), 157.10 (2) (a) 1. to 4., 157.10 (2) (b), 157.10 (3), 157.10 (6), 157.10 (7), 157.62 (2) (b) 6m., 157.62 (3) (b) 2g., 157.62 (3) (b) 2r., 157.62 (5) (a) to (j), 182.0175 (2) (c) and 440.97 of the statutes; Relating to: powers and duties of cemetery authorities; inheritance of cemetery lots in which human remains are buried; exemption of cemeteries from certain requirements concerning excavation; the powers and duties of the Cemetery Board, the Department of Safety and Professional Services, and the Department of Financial institutions; requiring the exercise of rule-making authority; and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Powers and duties of cemetery authorities; inheritance of cemetery lots in which human remains are buried; exemption of cemeteries from certain requirements concerning excavation; the powers and duties of the Cemetery Board, the Department of Safety and Professional Services, and the Department of Financial institutions; requiring the exercise of rule-making authority; and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:12 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Sanfelippo |
2016-01-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sanfelippo |
2015-12-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-12-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 13, Noes 1 |
2015-11-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-11-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-10-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab410 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB410.pdf |