WI AB490 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 823.23 (1) (e), 823.23 (2) (a), 823.23 (2) (b) (intro.), 823.23 (2) (d), 823.23 (2) (h) 2., 823.23 (6) (b) 1. and 823.23 (7) (c) 2. of the statutes; relating to: receivership for abatement of residential nuisances.
Title
Receivership for abatement of residential nuisances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-01-26 | Laid on the table | |
2010-01-22 | Referred to Calendar | |
2010-01-22 | Report passage recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 6, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-20 | Executive action taken | |
2009-11-17 | Public hearing held | |
2009-10-13 | Read first time and referred to committee on Urban and Local Affairs | |
2009-10-13 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab490 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB490.pdf |