WI AB569 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.61 (4) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the location and operation of driver schools.
Title
The location and operation of driver schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Published 3-23-2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 202 |
2024-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-01-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-01-16 | House | Representatives Gustafson and O'Connor added as coauthors |
2024-01-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-01-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-01-16 | House | Read a second time |
2024-01-11 | House | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-04 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2024-01-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2023-12-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-12-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative VanderMeer |
2023-11-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-10-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development |
2023-10-26 | House | Introduced |