WI AB618 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 84.30 (5r) (a); to amend 84.30 (5r) (title), 84.30 (5r) (b) and 84.30 (5r) (c); and to create 84.30 (5r) (a) 1. and 84.30 (5r) (e) of the statutes; relating to: outdoor advertising signs that are relocated because of state highway projects. (FE)
Title
Outdoor advertising signs that are relocated because of state highway projects. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Sen. David Craig [R] | Rep. Jim Steineke [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Karl Van Roy [R] | Rep. Evan Wynn [R] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-02-23 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation |
2012-02-23 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab618 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB618.pdf |