WI AB618 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 13.94 (1) (dL) and 13.94 (1s) (c) 6.; and to amend 13.94 (1) (de) and 13.94 (1) (mg) of the statutes; Relating to: audits performed by the Legislative Audit Bureau. (FE)
Title
Audits performed by the Legislative Audit Bureau. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 355 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-30-2018 |
2018-01-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-11-09 | House | Introduced |