WI AB621 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 165.77 (4) (am) 2. b. and 165.77 (4) (am) 3. b.; and to create 165.77 (4) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: expungement of deoxyribonucleic acid from crime laboratories if person not adjudicated guilty or delinquent. (FE)
Title
Expungement of deoxyribonucleic acid from crime laboratories if person not adjudicated guilty or delinquent. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-02-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-02-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-26 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Knudson |
2016-01-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Knudson |
2015-12-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-12-29 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab621 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB621.pdf |