WI AB732 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: a substance use disorder treatment platform. (FE)
Title
A substance use disorder treatment platform. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Human Services, Children and Families |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2022-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-18 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2022-01-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-12-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention |
2021-12-02 | House | Introduced |