WI AB793 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 26. a., 71.05 (6) (a) 26. b., 71.05 (6) (a) 26. c., 71.05 (6) (b) 32. a., 71.05 (6) (b) 32. ae., 71.05 (6) (b) 32. am., 71.07 (10) (a) 1., 71.07 (10) (a) 3., 71.07 (10) (b), 71.07 (10) (c) 2., 71.28 (10) (c) 2., 71.47 (10) (c) 2. and 224.50 (2) (a); and to create 71.05 (6) (b) 32. ap., 71.07 (10) (c) 3., 71.28 (10) (c) 3., 71.47 (10) (c) 3. and 71.98 (11) of the statutes; Relating to: modifying the tax treatment of college savings accounts and the employee college savings account contribution credit. (FE)
Title
Modifying the tax treatment of college savings accounts and the employee college savings account contribution credit. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Published 3-22-2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 148 |
2024-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions requested |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | House | Representative Bodden added as a coauthor |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-12 | House | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor |
2024-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2024-01-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2024-01-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Binsfeld and Joers |
2024-01-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-12-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-12-08 | House | Introduced |