WI AB822 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 995.40 of the statutes; Relating to: eligibility to receive occupational credentials for recipients of deferred action under the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals program. (FE)
Title
Eligibility to receive occupational credentials for recipients of deferred action under the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-04-03 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-03-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2024-03-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2024-02-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-05 | House | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor |
2024-02-02 | House | Representative Myers added as a coauthor |
2024-01-24 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-24 | House | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a coauthor |
2024-01-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Macco |
2024-01-08 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-12-14 | House | Representatives Jacobson and Palmeri added as coauthors |
2023-12-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-12-12 | House | Representatives Sinicki, Subeck and Schraa added as coauthors |
2023-12-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2023-12-08 | House | Introduced |