WI AB893 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 25.29 (1) (a) and 341.14 (6r) (fm) 7.; and to create 25.40 (1) (a) 37., 27.01 (7) (c) 13., 341.14 (6r) (b) 22. and 341.14 (6r) (f) 70. of the statutes; Relating to: special registration plates providing admission to state parks and recreation areas and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Special registration plates providing admission to state parks and recreation areas and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Don Vruwink [D] | Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] | Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R] | Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. David Crowley [D] | Rep. Chris Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab893 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB893.pdf |