WI AB942 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 50.035 (1); and to create 50.034 (3) (f), 50.034 (3) (g), 50.034 (3) (h), 50.034 (3m), 50.035 (1) (b), 50.035 (1m), 50.035 (7), 50.035 (8), 50.04 (2) (e), 50.04 (2k), 50.04 (2m), 50.15, 50.921, 50.922 and 50.935 of the statutes; Relating to: fall prevention and recovery training, CPR and first aid certification, a duty to provide aid in certain residential facilities and hospices, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Fall prevention and recovery training, CPR and first aid certification, a duty to provide aid in certain residential facilities and hospices, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2024-02-15 | House | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Palmeri |
2024-02-13 | House | LRB correction |
2024-02-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-01 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2024-01-17 | House | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor |
2024-01-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care |
2024-01-12 | House | Introduced |