WI AJR113 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report correctly enrolled on 2-16-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report correctly enrolled on 2-16-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming February 2024 to be American Heart Month in Wisconsin.
Title
Proclaiming February 2024 to be American Heart Month in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-16-2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Concurred in |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2024-02-13 | House | Adopted |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2024-02-12 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2024-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced |