WI SB1022 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 227.139 (4) (b); and to create 227.139 (4) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: creating an exemption to certain requirements for rules promulgated by the Department of Natural Resources relating to groundwater protection standards for PFAS.
Title
Creating an exemption to certain requirements for rules promulgated by the Department of Natural Resources relating to groundwater protection standards for PFAS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senator Wirch added as a coauthor |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senator Agard added as a coauthor |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced |