WI SB11 | 2011 | January Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on September 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on September 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to: state finances, collective bargaining for public employees, compensation and fringe benefits of public employees, the state civil service system, the Medical Assistance program, sale of certain facilities, granting bonding authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
State finances, collective bargaining for public employees, compensation and fringe benefits of public employees, the state civil service system, the Medical Assistance program, sale of certain facilities, granting bonding authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2011-06-16 | Laid on the table | |
2011-06-16 | Rules suspended and taken up | |
2011-02-18 | LRB correction | |
2011-02-17 | Read a third time | |
2011-02-17 | Rules suspended | |
2011-02-17 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2011-02-17 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2011-02-17 | Read a second time | |
2011-02-17 | Placed on calendar 2-17-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2011-02-17 | Available for scheduling | |
2011-02-17 | Report passage as amended, with emergency statement attached, pursuant to s.16.47 (2), Wisconsin Statutes, recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 | |
2011-02-17 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 | |
2011-02-17 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2011-02-16 | Executive action taken | |
2011-02-16 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2011-02-16 | Report of joint survey committee on Retirement Systems received | |
2011-02-15 | Public hearing held | |
2011-02-14 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2011-02-14 | Emergency statement attached by Governor pursuant to s. 16.47 (2) Wisconsin Statutes | |
2011-02-14 | Report of joint survey committee on Retirement Systems requested | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/jr1/sen/bill/sb11 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/JR1/SB11.pdf |