WI SB245 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 49.823; and to create 49.45 (2) (a) 3m., 49.471 (4d) and (4j) and 49.823 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: disenrollment of ineligible individuals from and redeterminations of eligibility for the BadgerCare Plus program and database confirmation for public assistance program eligibility. (FE)
Title
Disenrollment of ineligible individuals from and redeterminations of eligibility for the BadgerCare Plus program and database confirmation for public assistance program eligibility. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stafsholt |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Introduced |