WI SB253 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on December 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-03 - Published 12-15-2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on December 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-03 - Published 12-15-2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.41 (2) of the statutes; relating to: traffic control devices used by school safety patrols.
Title
Traffic control devices used by school safety patrols.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-03 | Published 12-15-2009. | |
2009-12-01 | Report approved by the Governor on 12-1-2009. 2009 Wisconsin Act 88 | |
2009-11-30 | Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2009 | |
2009-11-06 | Report correctly enrolled on 11-6-2009 | |
2009-11-04 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2009-11-03 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-03 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2009-11-03 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-03 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-03 | Read a second time | |
2009-11-03 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | |
2009-10-29 | Placed on calendar 11-3-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-10-23 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-10-22 | Received from Senate | |
2009-10-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-10-20 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-10-20 | Rules suspended | |
2009-10-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-20 | Read a second time | |
2009-10-13 | Placed on calendar 10-20-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-10-05 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-10-05 | Report passage recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-09-30 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-17 | Public hearing held | |
2009-08-05 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-08-05 | Introduced |