WI SB253 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - Published 12-20-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - Published 12-20-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 292.15 (4); to amend 20.370 (2) (dh), 292.15 (2) (a) 2., 292.15 (5), 292.15 (7) (d) and 292.15 (7) (e); and to create 289.31 (10) and 292.15 (2) (av) of the statutes; relating to: the liability of certain persons for environmental contamination on property on which a cleanup has been conducted. (FE)
Title
The liability of certain persons for environmental contamination on property on which a cleanup has been conducted. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-02 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-12 | Senate | Published 12-20-2011 |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-7-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 103 |
2011-12-06 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-5-2011 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 11-9-2011 |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2011-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-11-03 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2011-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-03 | House | Read a second time |
2011-11-03 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2011-11-03 | House | Read |
2011-11-03 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and taken up |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-2-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-10-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-10-28 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Natural Resources and Environment, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2011-10-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Environment |
2011-10-21 | Senate | Introduced |