WI SB509 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 341.01 (2) (a), 347.21 (2), 348.05 (2) (c), 348.05 (3), 348.17 (6) (a) 3. and 348.27 (14); to renumber 100.47 (3); to renumber and amend 348.05 (2g), 348.07 (2) (e) and 348.17 (5); to amend 100.47 (2) (c), 100.47 (4) (intro.), 341.05 (17), 346.09 (1), 346.09 (3) (b), 346.13 (1), (2) and (3), 347.21 (1m), 347.22 (2), 347.245 (1), 347.245 (5), 348.05 (2) (a), 348.05 (2) (a), 348.06 (2), 348.07 (1), 348.08 (1) (b), 348.08 (1) (d), 348.08 (2), 348.15 (3) (b), 348.15 (3) (d), 348.15 (3) (f) 2., 348.15 (8), 348.16 (2), 348.17 (6) (a) 2., 348.21 (3) (intro.), 348.25 (4) (intro.), 348.25 (8) (b) (intro.), 348.25 (8) (e) and 348.25 (8) (f); to repeal and recreate 340.01 (24); and to create 100.47 (3) (b), 227.01 (13) (rs), 340.01 (1o), 346.05 (1) (g), 346.13 (4), 347.24 (3), 347.25 (2g), 348.01 (2) (bg), 348.01 (2) (bp), 348.02 (6), 348.03, 348.05 (2) (am), 348.05 (2g), 348.05 (2g) (b), 348.07 (2) (e) 1., 348.07 (2m), 348.09 (3), 348.15 (3) (g), 348.15 (9), 348.17 (5) (a) 1. and 2., 348.21 (3t) and 348.27 (19) of the statutes; Relating to: operation of agricultural vehicles on highways and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Operation of agricultural vehicles on highways and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 377 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 82, Noes 11 |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 57, Noes 36 |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Vruwink |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Ripp, Tauchen and Nerison |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 56, Noes 37 |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Vruwink |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:39 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2014-03-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | Printed engrossed by the direction of the Assembly Chief Clerk |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |