WI SB623 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.835 (1) (em), 60.85 (1) (f), 66.1105 (2) (d), 70.11 (42), 70.1105 (2), 70.53 (1) (a), 70.995 (12r), 71.07 (5n) (a) 5. d., 71.28 (5n) (a) 5. d., 76.07 (4g) (a) 11. and 12. and 76.69; to renumber 79.096 (1); to renumber and amend 77.51 (12t) and 79.096 (2) (a); to amend 60.85 (1) (h) 1. c., 60.85 (1) (o), 66.0435 (3) (g), 66.1105 (2) (f) 1. c., 66.1106 (1) (k), 70.04 (1r), 70.043, 70.05 (5) (a) 1., 70.10, 70.1105 (1), 70.111 (19) (b), 70.13 (1), 70.13 (2), 70.13 (3), 70.13 (7), 70.15 (2), 70.17 (1), 70.174, 70.18, 70.19, 70.20, 70.21 (1), 70.21 (1m) (intro.), 70.21 (2), 70.22 (1), 70.22 (2) (a), 70.27 (1), 70.27 (3) (a), 70.27 (4), 70.27 (5), 70.27 (7) (b), 70.29, 70.30 (intro.), 70.34, 70.345, 70.35 (1), 70.35 (2), 70.35 (3), 70.35 (4), 70.35 (5), 70.36 (1), 70.36 (2), 70.43 (2), 70.44 (1), 70.47 (7) (aa), 70.49 (2), 70.50, 70.52, 70.65 (2) (a) 2., 70.65 (2) (b) (intro.), 70.68 (1), 70.73 (1) (b), 70.73 (1) (c), 70.84, 70.855 (1) (intro.), 70.855 (1) (a), 70.855 (1) (b), 70.995 (1) (a), 70.995 (3), 70.995 (4), 70.995 (5), 70.995 (7) (b), 70.995 (8) (b) 1., 70.995 (12) (a), 71.07 (5n) (a) 5. a., 71.07 (5n) (a) 9. (intro.), 71.07 (5n) (a) 9. a., 71.07 (5n) (d) 2., 71.07 (6e) (a) 5., 71.07 (9) (a) 3., 71.17 (2), 71.28 (5n) (a) 5. a., 71.28 (5n) (a) 9. (intro.), 71.28 (5n) (a) 9. a., 71.28 (5n) (d) 2., 71.52 (7), 73.01 (5) (a), 73.06 (3), 76.02 (1), 76.025 (2), 76.03 (1), 76.07 (2), 76.07 (4g) (a) 10., 76.07 (4g) (a) 13., 76.24 (2) (a), 76.28 (9), 76.31, 76.82, 76.84 (4), 77.04 (1), 77.54 (20n) (d) 2., 77.54 (20n) (d) 3., 77.54 (57d) (b) 1., 77.84 (1), 78.55 (1), 79.095 (3), 174.065 (3), 815.18 (3) (intro.) and 978.05 (6) (a); to create 16.5185 (3), 60.85 (5) (j), 66.1105 (5) (j), 66.1106 (4) (e), 70.111 (28), 70.17 (3), 70.995 (5n), 71.07 (5n) (a) 9. c., 71.28 (5n) (a) 9. c., 76.02 (4m), 76.025 (5), 76.074, 77.51 (12t) (a) to (c), 79.096 (1) (b), 79.096 (2) (a) 2., 79.096 (2) (c) and 79.096 (2) (d) of the statutes; and to affect 2021 Wisconsin Act 58, section 9125 (1); Relating to: repealing the personal property tax, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Repealing the personal property tax, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Introduced |