WI SB874 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Published 3-23-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 301.45 (5) (b) 1., 301.45 (5m) (b) 3. and 301.46 (2m) (am) 1. and 2. of the statutes; Relating to: counting convictions and findings for the purpose of the sex offender registry and notifications.
Title
Counting convictions and findings for the purpose of the sex offender registry and notifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | Published 3-23-2024 |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-29-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 254 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-02-14 | House | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-15 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2024-02-14 | House | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 24, Noes 8 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Wimberger |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wimberger |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Introduced |