WI SJR56 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-22 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-22 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming the month of October as Breast Cancer Awareness Month.
Title
Proclaiming the month of October as Breast Cancer Awareness Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2013-10-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2013-10-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-17 | House | Concurred in |
2013-10-15 | House | Placed on calendar 10-17-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-10-15 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2013-10-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-15-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Representative Thiesfeldt added as a cosponsor |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2013-10-14 | Senate | Introduced |