WV HB2518 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 176, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 176, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to give the Board of Pharmacy rule-making authority to permit a pharmacist or pharmacy intern to administer certain immunizations.
Title
Creating a legislative rule to permit a pharmacist or pharmacy intern to administer certain immunizations
Sponsors
Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] |
Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Martin Atkinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 341) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 88) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Advance bill to 3rd with restricted right to amend (Roll No. 85) (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 88) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Advance bill to 3rd with restricted right to amend (Roll No. 85) (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 176, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-08 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-06 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | To Governor 4/6/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 341) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-15 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-15 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-15 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 88) |
2017-03-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-14 | House | Amended on 3rd reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2017-03-14 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender |
2017-03-13 | House | Advance bill to 3rd with restricted right to amend (Roll No. 85) |
2017-03-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Do pass |
2017-02-24 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-02-24 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2017-02-16 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-16 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization |
2017-02-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |