WV HB2653 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
This purpose of this bill is to extend the multistate real-time tracking system to June 30, 2023.
Title
Extending the Multi State Real-Time Tracking System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 346) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 59) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 59) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 45, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-08 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-06 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | To Governor 4/6/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 346) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-07 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-07 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 59) |
2017-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-01 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2017-03-01 | House | Do pass |
2017-02-22 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-22 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2017-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60A | 10 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |