WV HB2683 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 132, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 132, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the West Virginia Guaranty Association Act. The bill modifies the scope and construction of the act. It adds and amends definitions; clarifies and adds powers, duties and rights of association. The bill modifies provisions concerning effect of paid claims, exhaustion of coverage, prevention of insolvencies and stay of proceedings. It changes due date of annual financial report and limits covered claims. The bill expands association’s right to recover and be reimbursed. The bill provides for confidentiality of financial information and exempts certain reports and recommendations from Freedom of Information Act.
Title
Relating to West Virginia Insurance Guaranty Association Act
Sponsors
Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Del. Brad White [R] | Del. Danny Hamrick [R] | Del. William Hartman [D] |
Del. Cindy Frich [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 527) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 435) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 381) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 108) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 435) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 381) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 108) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 132, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 527) |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 435) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate requests return of bill from House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 381) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-17 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 108) |
2017-03-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-16 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-14 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-13 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-03 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-23 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB434 (Similar To) 2017-03-14 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 26 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |