WV HB2878 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase from $200 million to $500 million the amount the Division of Highways is allowed to use to apply for Federal Grant Anticipation Notes to be reimbursed from the funds made available to West Virginia from the federal government’s Highway Fund for West Virginia. Funds obtained from this federal grant will only be used for the completion of interstate or other highway facilities designated as part of the federal-aid highway system or for toll bridges.
Title
Increasing amount of authorized Federal Grant Anticipation Notes for which Division of Highways may apply
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 315) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 226) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 226) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/10/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/10/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/10/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-04 | House | To Governor 4/4/17 |
2017-04-04 | House | To Governor 4/4/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-04 | Senate | To Governor 4/4/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-01 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 315) |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-31 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-30 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 226) |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2017-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | Do pass |
2017-03-09 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-09 | House | To Finance |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB421 (Similar To) 2017-03-29 - Committed to Rules on 3rd reading
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 17A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |