WV HB2948 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require certain state agencies to take final action on certain completed permit applications within thirty days if uncontested, or ninety days if contested, unless other timelines exist.
Title
Establishing timelines for taking final action on certain permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 450) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 400) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 352) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 181) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 400) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 352) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 181) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 113, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/21/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-21 | House | To Governor 4/21/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/21/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 450) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2017-04-06 | House | House further considered bill |
2017-04-06 | House | The bill still being in possession of the clerk |
2017-04-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 400) |
2017-04-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 352) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 181) |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-03-13 | House | To House Energy |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-13 | House | To Energy then Judiciary |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 17A | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 12D | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 15 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 1A | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 2A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 34 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 35 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 9A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 7A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 12 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 15 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24A | 3 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 1A | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |