WV HB3116 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove the daily limit on nonintoxicating beer and nonintoxicating craft beer growler sales for brewers, brew pubs, retailers and private clubs.
Title
Removing current limitations on sales of nonintoxicating beer and nonintoxicating craft beer growlers
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Del. William Hartman [D] | Del. Sean Hornbuckle [D] | Del. Gary Howell [R] |
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 16 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 6b | Amended Code | Citation Text |