WV HB4176 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 296, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 296, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
West Virginia Intelligence/Fusion Center Act
Title
West Virginia Intelligence/Fusion Center Act
Sponsors
Del. Rodney Miller [D] | Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. John Shott [R] |
Del. David Kelly [R] | Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] | Del. Joseph Canestraro [D] | Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 625) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 760) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 574) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 338) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 760) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 574) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 338) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 296, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 625) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 760) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Sypolt Title amendment adopted |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Gov Org Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 574) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Substitute amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/6/20 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 338) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2020-02-25 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2020-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-14 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | 9 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 9 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 9 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 9 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 9 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 9 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 9 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 9 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |