WV HB4338 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 123, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 123, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to raise the maximum value amount of an abandoned motor vehicle $2,500 to $7,500 before someone hired by an enforcement agency may sell that vehicle at a private sale or auction. The bill requires an additional $10 fee be paid to the Division of Motor Vehicles for titling an abandoned vehicle. The bill also clarifies two definitions.
Title
Raising the maximum value amount of an abandoned motor vehicle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 266) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 74) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 74) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 123, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-15 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/10/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/10/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-10 | To Governor 3/10/12 | |
2012-03-08 | House Message received | |
2012-03-07 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-07 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 266) | |
2012-03-07 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-07 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-07 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-06 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-05 | Immediate consideration | |
2012-03-05 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-05 | Reported do pass, with amendment | |
2012-02-20 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-20 | House Message received | |
2012-02-17 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-17 | Passed House (Roll No. 74) | |
2012-02-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-17 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-16 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-15 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-15 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-01-30 | To House Roads and Transportation | |
2012-01-30 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-30 | To Roads and Transportation then Finance | |
2012-01-30 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 24A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |