WV HB4383 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to make individuals responsible for the costs relating to the filing of excessive false complaints with state agencies and departments.
Title
Making individuals responsible for the costs relating to the filing of excessive false complaints
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 577) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 362) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 161) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 362) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 161) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 577) |
2016-03-12 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2016-03-12 | House | Placed at foot of messages |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 362) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2016-02-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 161) |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-19 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-03 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |